IA SF160 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Read first time, referred to Education. H.J. 568.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to recommendations regarding school building emergency operations plans. (Formerly SSB 1042.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to recommendations regarding school building emergency operations plans. (Formerly SSB 1042.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19HouseRead first time, referred to Education. H.J. 568.
2019-03-19HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 567.
2019-03-18SenateImmediate message. S.J. 646.
2019-03-18SenatePassed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 643.
2019-01-31SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 210.
2019-01-31SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 205.

Same As/Similar To

SSB1042 (Related) 2019-01-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback