IA SF162 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Subcommittee reassigned: R. Smith, Chapman, and Giddens. S.J. 728.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the examination and copying of a public record under Iowa's open records law and federal copyright law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the examination and copying of a public record under Iowa's open records law and federal copyright law.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25SenateSubcommittee reassigned: R. Smith, Chapman, and Giddens. S.J. 728.
2019-02-19SenateSubcommittee reassigned: R. Smith, Chapman, and Lykam. S.J. 343.
2019-02-06SenateSubcommittee: Danielson, Chapman, and R. Smith. S.J. 246.
2019-01-31SenateIntroduced, referred to State Government. S.J. 205.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback