IA SF167 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-27 - Rereferred to Education. H.J. 1076.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to eligibility for the health care loan repayment program. (Formerly SSB 1030.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to eligibility for the health care loan repayment program. (Formerly SSB 1030.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-27HouseRereferred to Education. H.J. 1076.
2019-04-11HousePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 843.
2019-04-03HouseCommittee report, recommending passage. H.J. 738.
2019-04-03HouseSubcommittee recommends passage.
2019-04-01HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 04/03/2019 9:30AM House Lounge.
2019-04-01HouseSubcommittee: Kerr, Dolecheck and James. H.J. 707.
2019-03-26HouseRead first time, referred to Education. H.J. 649.
2019-03-26HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 647.
2019-03-26SenateImmediate message. S.J. 738.
2019-03-26SenatePassed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 734.
2019-01-31SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 210.
2019-01-31SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 206.

Same As/Similar To

SSB1030 (Related) 2019-01-29 - Subcommittee recommends passage.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback