IA SF170 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the publication duties of and the filling of vacancies on county agricultural extension councils and including effective date and applicability provisions. Effective 5-2-19.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the publication duties of and the filling of vacancies on county agricultural extension councils and including effective date and applicability provisions. Effective 5-2-19.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateSigned by Governor.
2019-04-30SenateReported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
2019-04-17SenateMessage from House. S.J. 995.
2019-04-17HouseImmediate message. H.J. 899.
2019-04-24HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1012.
2019-04-17HousePassed House, yeas 97 nays none. H.J. 896.
2019-04-17HouseMotion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 895.
2019-04-17HouseMotion to suspend rules to consider amendment H-1221. H.J. 894.
2019-04-17HousePoint of order raised on H-1221, ruled not germane. H.J. 894.
2019-04-16HouseAmendment H-1221 filed. H.J. 885.
2019-04-11HousePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 843.
2019-04-03HouseCommittee report, recommending passage. H.J. 738.
2019-04-02HouseSubcommittee recommends passage.
2019-04-01HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 04/02/2019 9:15AM House Lounge.
2019-04-01HouseSubcommittee: Baxter, Bearinger and Kerr. H.J. 707.
2019-03-29HouseRead first time, referred to Agriculture. H.J. 693.
2019-03-28HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 689.
2019-03-28SenateImmediate message. S.J. 786.
2019-03-28SenatePassed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 785.
2019-02-12SenateCommittee report, recommending passage. S.J. 288.
2019-02-05SenateSubcommittee: Rozenboom, Costello, and Ragan. S.J. 233.
2019-02-04SenateIntroduced, referred to Agriculture. S.J. 213.

Same As/Similar To

HF627 (Similar To) 2019-04-17 - Withdrawn. H.J. 899.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback