IA SF18 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-06 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-06 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the elimination of the certificate of need process relating to the development of a new or changed institutional health service.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the elimination of the certificate of need process relating to the development of a new or changed institutional health service.
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Zaun [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2019 12:00PM RM 24. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Subcommittee: Garrett, Edler, and Mathis. S.J. 124. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 82. |
Same As/Similar To
HF162 (Similar To) 2019-01-30 - Introduced, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 182.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF18 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF18.html |