IA SF202 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 610. S.J. 827.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 610. S.J. 827.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to youth deer and youth wild turkey hunting licenses, and providing effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 47; See SF 610.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to youth deer and youth wild turkey hunting licenses, and providing effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 47; See SF 610.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 610. S.J. 827. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Subcommittee: Brown, Edler, and J. Smith. S.J. 546. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 514. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 249. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 244. |
Same As/Similar To
SF47 (Similar To) 2019-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 202. S.J. 249.
SF610 (Similar To) 2020-01-23 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
SF610 (Similar To) 2020-01-23 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF202 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF202.html |