IA SF2118 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Subcommittee: Fisher, Prichard and Sexton. H.J. 329.
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Subcommittee: Fisher, Prichard and Sexton. H.J. 329.
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to youth deer hunting license seasonal use restrictions. (Formerly SF 2001.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to youth deer hunting license seasonal use restrictions. (Formerly SF 2001.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-20 | House | Subcommittee: Fisher, Prichard and Sexton. H.J. 329. |
2018-02-20 | House | Read first time, referred to Natural Resources. H.J. 311. |
2018-02-19 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 299. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 369. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 366. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 174. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 171. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2001 (Similar To) 2018-01-18 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.