IA SF216 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 557. S.J. 522.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 557. S.J. 522.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to demolition reserves on fire and casualty claims on real property located within a city and requesting an interim study on such reserves. (See SF 557.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to demolition reserves on fire and casualty claims on real property located within a city and requesting an interim study on such reserves. (See SF 557.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 557. S.J. 522. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Subcommittee: Miller-Meeks, Nunn, and Quirmbach. S.J. 287. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Commerce. S.J. 254. |
Same As/Similar To
HF225 (Similar To) 2019-04-27 - Rereferred to Commerce. H.J. 1076.
SF557 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Subcommittee Meeting: 01/22/2020 1:00PM RM 315.
SF557 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Subcommittee Meeting: 01/22/2020 1:00PM RM 315.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF216 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF216.html |