IA SF2233 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-26 - Withdrawn. S.J. 439.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-26 - Withdrawn. S.J. 439.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the administration of driving skills tests required for a commercial driver’s license. (Formerly SSB 3046.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the administration of driving skills tests required for a commercial driver’s license. (Formerly SSB 3046.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 439. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | HF 2197 substituted. S.J. 437. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 2197. S.J. 379. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 297. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 284. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB536 (Related) 2018-01-24 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SSB3046 (Related) 2018-01-31 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF2197 (Similar To) 2018-03-07 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 514.
SSB3046 (Related) 2018-01-31 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF2197 (Similar To) 2018-03-07 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 514.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF2233 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF2233.html |