IA SF2356 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-18 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the education of students with characteristics of dyslexia and to the preparation and licensure of practitioners for such instruction, and establishing an Iowa dyslexia board. (Formerly SF 2235.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the education of students with characteristics of dyslexia and to the preparation and licensure of practitioners for such instruction, and establishing an Iowa dyslexia board. (Formerly SF 2235.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-18HouseFiscal note.
2020-06-17HouseSigned by Governor. S.J. 864.
2020-06-16HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 862.
2020-06-11HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 694.
2020-06-11SenateImmediate message. S.J. 771.
2020-06-11SenatePassed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 769.
2020-06-11SenateSenate concurred with S-5136. S.J. 769.
2020-06-11SenateFiscal note.
2020-06-10SenateMessage from House, with amendment S-5136. S.J. 752.
2020-06-10HouseImmediate message. H.J. 688.
2020-06-10HousePassed House, yeas 98, none. H.J. 676.
2020-06-10HouseAmendment H-8196 lost. H.J. 675.
2020-06-10HouseCommittee amendment H-8174 adopted. H.J. 675.
2020-06-04HouseAmendment H-8196 filed. H.J. 646.
2020-06-03HouseCommittee amendment H-8174 filed. H.J. 632.
2020-06-03HouseCommittee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 631.
2020-05-05HouseFiscal note.
2020-03-11HouseSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
2020-03-10HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 03/11/2020 7:45AM House Lounge.
2020-03-09HouseSubcommittee Meeting: Or at the end of caucuses-start of Debate House Lounge.
2020-03-03HouseSubcommittee: Salmon, Brink and James. H.J. 445.
2020-03-02HouseRead first time, referred to Education. H.J. 411.
2020-02-27HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 397.
2020-02-26SenateImmediate message. S.J. 445.
2020-02-26SenatePassed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 442.
2020-02-20SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 373.
2020-02-20SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 370.

Same As/Similar To

SF2235 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2356. S.J. 373.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback