IA SF237 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-27 - Rereferred to Judiciary. H.J. 1076.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-27 - Rereferred to Judiciary. H.J. 1076.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the membership and procedures of the state judicial nominating commission and district judicial nominating commission and to the selection and qualifications of judges, associate judges, and the chief justice, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1101.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the membership and procedures of the state judicial nominating commission and district judicial nominating commission and to the selection and qualifications of judges, associate judges, and the chief justice, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1101.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-27 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary. H.J. 1076. |
2019-03-14 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 562. |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 529. |
2019-03-13 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 527. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 591. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 32, nays 17. S.J. 590. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Amendment S-3020 adopted. S.J. 590. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Amendment S-3026 to S-3020 filed, lost. S.J. 589. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Amendment S-3020 filed. S.J. 589. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Amendment S-3025 filed, lost. S.J. 588. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 574. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 276. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 270. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB110 (Related) 2019-02-21 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 347.
SSB1101 (Related) 2019-02-05 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2019 3:00PM RM 116.
HF503 (Similar To) 2019-04-27 - Referred to Judiciary. H.J. 1076.
SSB1101 (Related) 2019-02-05 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2019 3:00PM RM 116.
HF503 (Similar To) 2019-04-27 - Referred to Judiciary. H.J. 1076.