IA SF2418 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - NOBA: Graybook
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - NOBA: Graybook
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to appropriations for health and human services and veterans and including other related provisions and appropriations, providing penalties, and including effective date and retroactive and other applicability date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3222.) Item vetoed. Various effective dates; see bill.
Title
A bill for an act relating to appropriations for health and human services and veterans and including other related provisions and appropriations, providing penalties, and including effective date and retroactive and other applicability date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3222.) Item vetoed. Various effective dates; see bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 26 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 55 N: 35 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 55 N: 35 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | House | NOBA: Graybook |
2018-06-01 | House | Item vetoed, signed by Governor S.J. 1089. |
2018-05-05 | House | NOBA: Final |
2018-05-05 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1086. |
2018-05-05 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 987. |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1069. |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 21. S.J. 1068. |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-5311. S.J. 1067. |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-5311. S.J. 1060. |
2018-05-04 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 971. |
2018-05-05 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 993. |
2018-05-04 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 996. |
2018-05-04 | House | Passed House, ayes 55, nays 35. H.J. 970. |
2018-05-04 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 996. |
2018-05-04 | House | Amendment H-8501 adopted. H.J. 969. |
2018-05-04 | House | Amendment H-8501 filed. H.J. 968. |
2018-05-04 | House | Substituted for HF 2501. H.J. 968. |
2018-05-04 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 968. |
2018-05-04 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 967. |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1053. |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Explanation of vote. S.J. 1078. |
2018-05-04 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Floor |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 27, nays 20. S.J. 1053. |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Amendment S-5308 lost. S.J. 1052. |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Point of order raised on S-5308, ruled in order. S.J. 1051. |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Amendment S-5308 filed. S.J. 1051. |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Amendment S-5309 filed, lost. S.J. 1051. |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Amendment S-5306 filed, adopted. S.J. 1050. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Full Approps |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 1041. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 1040. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3222 (Related) 2018-05-03 - NOBA: Senate Sub
HSB700 (Related) 2018-05-03 - NOBA: House Sub
HF2501 (Similar To) 2018-05-04 - Withdrawn. H.J. 971.
HSB700 (Related) 2018-05-03 - NOBA: House Sub
HF2501 (Similar To) 2018-05-04 - Withdrawn. H.J. 971.