IA SF257 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Subcommittee reassigned: Feenstra, Brown, and Giddens. S.J. 848.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Subcommittee reassigned: Feenstra, Brown, and Giddens. S.J. 848.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act exempting from the hotel and motel tax the sales price of lodging furnished by nonprofit lodging providers renting to the friends and family of hospital patients.
Title
A bill for an act exempting from the hotel and motel tax the sales price of lodging furnished by nonprofit lodging providers renting to the friends and family of hospital patients.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Feenstra, Brown, and Giddens. S.J. 848. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Feenstra, Brown, and J. Smith. S.J. 344. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Subcommittee: Feenstra, Brown, and Danielson. S.J. 302. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 286. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF257 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF257.html |