IA SF267 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1194.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1194.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the practice of massage therapy, and providing penalties. (Formerly SSB 1037.) Effective 7-1-19.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the practice of massage therapy, and providing penalties. (Formerly SSB 1037.) Effective 7-1-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1194. |
2019-05-03 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1193. |
2019-04-22 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 929. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1033. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 1028. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-3162. S.J. 1028. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-3162. S.J. 964. |
2019-04-15 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 858. |
2019-04-17 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 899. |
2019-04-15 | House | Passed House, yeas 96 nays 1. H.J. 849. |
2019-04-15 | House | Amendment H-1209 adopted. H.J. 848. |
2019-04-15 | House | Substituted for HF 479. H.J. 848. |
2019-04-11 | House | Amendment H-1209 filed. H.J. 845. |
2019-03-14 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 562. |
2019-02-21 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 340. |
2019-02-20 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 330. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 353. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Explanation of vote. S.J. 393. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 352. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 313. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 307. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1037 (Related) 2019-01-31 - Subcommittee recommends passage.