IA SF315 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/28/2019 11:30AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/28/2019 11:30AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing the criminal offense of unlawful presence in the state, and providing penalties.
Title
A bill for an act establishing the criminal offense of unlawful presence in the state, and providing penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/28/2019 11:30AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/28/2019 11:30AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Subcommittee: Chapman, Garrett, and Kinney. S.J. 380. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 340. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF315 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF315.html |