IA SF326 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/04/2019 2:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/04/2019 2:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act prohibiting the expenditure of certain public moneys for dues or membership fees to certain high school athletic organizations.
Title
A bill for an act prohibiting the expenditure of certain public moneys for dues or membership fees to certain high school athletic organizations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/04/2019 2:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Subcommittee: Feenstra, R. Smith, and T. Taylor. S.J. 406. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. S.J. 359. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF326 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF326.html |