IA SF339 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-27 - Rereferred to Judiciary. H.J. 1076.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-27 - Rereferred to Judiciary. H.J. 1076.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to state employee defense and indemnification from certain claims and actions. (Formerly SSB 1068.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to state employee defense and indemnification from certain claims and actions. (Formerly SSB 1068.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-27 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary. H.J. 1076. |
2019-03-19 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 569. |
2019-03-19 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 568. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 646. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 645. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 382. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 374. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB10 (Related) 2019-02-06 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 231.
SSB1068 (Related) 2019-02-12 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF337 (Similar To) 2019-04-27 - Referred to Judiciary. H.J. 1076.
SSB1068 (Related) 2019-02-12 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF337 (Similar To) 2019-04-27 - Referred to Judiciary. H.J. 1076.