IA SF369 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-15 - Subcommittee: Zaun, Bisignano, and Dawson. S.J. 86.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-15 - Subcommittee: Zaun, Bisignano, and Dawson. S.J. 86.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act prohibiting the treatment of animals other than livestock and wild animals, providing for the rescue of animals by local law enforcement agencies, providing for criminal offenses and court orders, and including penalties. (Formerly SSB 1075.)
Title
A bill for an act prohibiting the treatment of animals other than livestock and wild animals, providing for the rescue of animals by local law enforcement agencies, providing for criminal offenses and court orders, and including penalties. (Formerly SSB 1075.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-15 | Senate | Subcommittee: Zaun, Bisignano, and Dawson. S.J. 86. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 858. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 391. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 387. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1075 (Related) 2019-02-13 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF369 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF369.html |