IA SF375 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Attached to similar HF 662. S.J. 589.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Attached to similar HF 662. S.J. 589.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act concerning jurors, relating to access to certain department of revenue taxpayer information for jury list compilation and juror information confidentiality. (Formerly SSB 1159.)
Title
A bill for an act concerning jurors, relating to access to certain department of revenue taxpayer information for jury list compilation and juror information confidentiality. (Formerly SSB 1159.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Attached to similar HF 662. S.J. 589. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 164. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/22/2020 11:30AM RM G17. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Subcommittee: Nunn, R. Taylor, and Whiting. S.J. 86. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 1191. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 857. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 410. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 400. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1159 (Related) 2019-02-21 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB178 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 405.
HF662 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Read first time, attached to similar SF 375. S.J. 589.
HSB178 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 405.
HF662 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Read first time, attached to similar SF 375. S.J. 589.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF375 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF375.html |