IA SF393 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-05 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 221.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-05 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 221.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for criminal offenses related to beekeeping. (Formerly SF 285.)
Title
A bill for an act providing for criminal offenses related to beekeeping. (Formerly SF 285.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 221. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/28/2020 1:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Subcommittee: R. Taylor, Sweeney, and Zaun. S.J. 86. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 858. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 411. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 403. |
Same As/Similar To
SF285 (Similar To) 2019-02-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 393. S.J. 411.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF393 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF393.html |