IA SF401 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 611. S.J. 827.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 611. S.J. 827.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the imposition of certain fees on public utilities for the use of public rights-of-way. (Formerly SSB 1152; See SF 611.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the imposition of certain fees on public utilities for the use of public rights-of-way. (Formerly SSB 1152; See SF 611.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 611. S.J. 827. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Subcommittee: Chapman, Nunn, and Quirmbach. S.J. 546. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 514. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 420. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 417. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB32 (Related) 2019-02-20 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 333.
SSB1152 (Related) 2019-02-18 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/19/2019 2:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
HF537 (Similar To) 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1081.
SF611 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1067.
SSB1152 (Related) 2019-02-18 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/19/2019 2:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
HF537 (Similar To) 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1081.
SF611 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1067.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF401 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF401.html |