IA SF416 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-27 - Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 1191.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-27 - Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 1191.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to reimbursement of witness mileage expenses. (Formerly SSB 1067.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to reimbursement of witness mileage expenses. (Formerly SSB 1067.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 1191. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 858. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 223. S.J. 441. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 436. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 426. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB6 (Related) 2019-01-30 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 186.
SSB1067 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF223 (Similar To) 2019-04-11 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 930.
SSB1067 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF223 (Similar To) 2019-04-11 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 930.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF416 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF416.html |