IA SF438 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the responsibilities and authority of school districts or school corporations, accredited nonpublic schools, area education agencies, community colleges, and board of regents institutions, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1190.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the responsibilities and authority of school districts or school corporations, accredited nonpublic schools, area education agencies, community colleges, and board of regents institutions, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1190.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2020-03-09 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/10/2020 8:30AM RM 308. |
2020-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2020 12:00PM RM 308. |
2019-04-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2019-04-01 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/01/2019 3:10PM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. |
2019-03-26 | House | Subcommittee: Wheeler, Dolecheck, Matson, Moore, T. and R. Smith. H.J. 652. |
2019-03-20 | House | Read first time, referred to Education. H.J. 590. |
2019-03-20 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 589. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 682. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Fiscal note, as amended and passed by the Senate. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 32, nays 17. S.J. 680. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Amendment S-3049 adopted, as amended. S.J. 680. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Amendment S-3055 to S-3049 filed, adopted. S.J. 680. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Amendment S-3047 withdrawn. S.J. 680. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Amendments S-3047 and S-3049 filed. S.J. 676. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 435. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 430. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1190 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Subcommittee recommends passage.