IA SF442 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-27 - Rereferred to Transportation. H.J. 1076.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to authorized emergency vehicles, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SSB 1090.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to authorized emergency vehicles, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SSB 1090.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-27HouseRereferred to Transportation. H.J. 1076.
2019-04-11HousePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 843.
2019-04-04HouseCommittee amendment H-1131 filed. H.J. 760.
2019-04-04HouseCommittee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 759.
2019-03-28HouseSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
2019-03-26HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 03/28/2019 8:30AM House Lounge.
2019-03-26HouseSubcommittee: Thorup, Huseman and R. Smith. H.J. 652.
2019-03-26HouseRead first time, referred to Transportation. H.J. 629.
2019-03-26HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 627.
2019-03-25SenateImmediate message. S.J. 723.
2019-03-25SenatePassed Senate, yeas 50, nays 0. S.J. 723.
2019-03-25SenateAmendment S-3072 filed, adopted. S.J. 723.
2019-02-28SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 440.
2019-02-28SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 431.

Same As/Similar To

SSB1090 (Related) 2019-02-14 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HSB154 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback