IA SF45 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - NOBA: Final
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - NOBA: Final
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for the development of a mandatory defined contribution pension plan for certain public employees.
Title
A bill for an act providing for the development of a mandatory defined contribution pension plan for certain public employees.
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Zaun [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | NOBA: Final |
2018-02-20 | Senate | NOBA: House Floor |
2018-02-19 | Senate | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Subcommittee: Schneider, Anderson, and Bowman. S.J. 106. |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. S.J. 61. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF45 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF45.html |