IA SF461 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-15 - Subcommittee: Sinclair, Shipley, and R. Taylor. S.J. 86.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-15 - Subcommittee: Sinclair, Shipley, and R. Taylor. S.J. 86.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to home improvement fraud and providing penalties for contractors who commit home improvement fraud. (Formerly SF 151.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to home improvement fraud and providing penalties for contractors who commit home improvement fraud. (Formerly SF 151.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-15 | Senate | Subcommittee: Sinclair, Shipley, and R. Taylor. S.J. 86. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 1191. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 857. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Amendment S-3012 filed. S.J. 474. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 457. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 450. |
Same As/Similar To
SF151 (Similar To) 2019-03-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 461. S.J. 457.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF461 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF461.html |