IA SF463 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1156.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1156.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to landlord remedies and procedures relating to failure to timely pay rent and forcible entry and detainer. (Formerly SSB 1053.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to landlord remedies and procedures relating to failure to timely pay rent and forcible entry and detainer. (Formerly SSB 1053.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 1156. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | HF 638 substituted. S.J. 1155. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Amendment S-3156 adopted. S.J. 1155. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Amendment S-3156 filed. S.J. 940. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 857. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Attached to similar HF 638. S.J. 794. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 458. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 450. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1053 (Related) 2019-02-21 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB116 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 383.
HF638 (Similar To) 2020-06-12 - Amendment H-8297 filed. H.J. 744.
HSB116 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 383.
HF638 (Similar To) 2020-06-12 - Amendment H-8297 filed. H.J. 744.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF463 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF463.html |