IA SF479 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-16 - Withdrawn. S.J. 980.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-16 - Withdrawn. S.J. 980.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to mental health and disability services, including the establishment of a children's behavioral health system and a children's behavioral health system state board, and requiring certain children's behavioral health core services. (Formerly SSB 1197.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to mental health and disability services, including the establishment of a children's behavioral health system and a children's behavioral health system state board, and requiring certain children's behavioral health core services. (Formerly SSB 1197.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 980. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | HF 690 substituted. S.J. 967. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Amendment S-3161 filed, adopted. S.J. 967. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 857. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Attached to similar HF 690. S.J. 714. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 471. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 466. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1197 (Related) 2019-02-25 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/27/2019 11:00AM RM 22.
HSB206 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 419.
HF690 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1083.
HSB206 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 419.
HF690 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1083.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF479 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF479.html |