IA SF487 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-15 - Subcommittee: Sinclair, Petersen, and Schultz. S.J. 87.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-15 - Subcommittee: Sinclair, Petersen, and Schultz. S.J. 87.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act modifying the periods of time to bring criminal actions for sexual offenses against a minor, providing penalties, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1054.)
Title
A bill for an act modifying the periods of time to bring criminal actions for sexual offenses against a minor, providing penalties, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1054.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-15 | Senate | Subcommittee: Sinclair, Petersen, and Schultz. S.J. 87. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 858. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 791. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 489. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 479. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB26 (Related) 2019-01-23 - Subcommittee Meeting: 01/29/2019 8:00AM House Lounge.
SSB1054 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SSB1054 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF487 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF487.html |