IA SF489 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1136.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1136.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the possession, sale, transfer, purchase, and use of fireworks, providing penalties, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1051 and SF 236.) Effective 5-9-17.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the possession, sale, transfer, purchase, and use of fireworks, providing penalties, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1051 and SF 236.) Effective 5-9-17.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - House - Passed House (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1136. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 1134. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1134. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1046. |
2017-04-18 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1049. |
2017-04-18 | House | Passed House, ayes 56, nays 41. H.J. 1049. |
2017-04-18 | House | Amendment H-1372 lost. H.J. 1048. |
2017-04-18 | House | Amendment H-1374 lost. H.J. 1047. |
2017-04-18 | House | Amendment H-1371 lost. H.J. 1046. |
2017-04-18 | House | Amendment H-1364 lost. H.J. 1045. |
2017-04-18 | House | Amendment H-1370 lost. H.J. 1044. |
2017-04-18 | House | Speaker ruled point well taken. H.J. 1044. |
2017-04-18 | House | Point of order raised Rule 10, decorum in debate. H.J. 1043. |
2017-04-17 | House | Amendments H-1364, H-1370, H-1371, H-1372 and H-1374 filed. H.J. 1037. |
2017-03-30 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 823. |
2017-03-22 | House | Subcommittee: Windschitl, Bloomingdale and Jacoby. H.J. 757. |
2017-03-22 | House | Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 713. |
2017-03-22 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 712. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 718. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Explanation of vote. S.J. 787. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 34, nays 14. S.J. 718. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment S-3205 lost. S.J. 717. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendments S-3204, S-3178, S-3206, and S-3207 withdrawn. S.J. 717. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendments S-3178, S-3204, S-3205, S-3206, and S-3207 filed. S.J. 717. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment S-3203 filed, lost. S.J. 716. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment S-3202 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 716. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment S-3201 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 716. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment S-3200 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 716. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment S-3179 filed, lost. S.J. 716. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment S-3183 filed, lost. S.J. 716. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment S-3212 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 715. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment S-3219 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 715. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment S-3211 filed, lost. S.J. 715. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment S-3180 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 715. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment S-3199 filed, lost. S.J. 714. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment S-3198 filed, lost. S.J. 714. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment S-3196 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 714. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment S-3177 filed, lost. S.J. 713. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment S-3197 filed, lost. S.J. 712. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment S-3195 filed, lost. S.J. 712. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment S-3218 filed, lost. S.J. 712. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment S-3193 filed, lost. S.J. 712. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment S-3192 filed, lost. S.J. 711. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment S-3191 filed, lost. S.J. 711. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment S-3190 filed, lost. S.J. 711. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment S-3182 filed, lost. S.J. 710. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment S-3194 filed, lost. S.J. 710. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment S-3187 filed, lost. S.J. 709. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment S-3186 filed, lost. S.J. 709. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment S-3188 filed, lost. S.J. 709. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment S-3189 filed, lost. S.J. 708. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment S-3181 filed, lost. S.J. 707. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment S-3176 filed, lost. S.J. 707. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment S-3214 filed, lost. S.J. 707. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment S-3185 filed, lost. S.J. 706. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment S-3210 filed, lost. S.J. 706. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment S-3209 filed, lost. S.J. 705. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment S-3184 filed, lost. S.J. 705. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 694. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 561. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 558. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1051 (Related) 2017-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF236 (Similar To) 2017-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB171 (Related) 2017-02-27 - Subcommittee: Windschitl, Bloomingdale and Jacoby. H.J. 517.
SF236 (Similar To) 2017-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB171 (Related) 2017-02-27 - Subcommittee: Windschitl, Bloomingdale and Jacoby. H.J. 517.