IA SF49 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 411. S.J. 438.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 411. S.J. 438.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act requiring county and city property assessors to stand for retention at election and including applicability provisions. (See SF 411.)
Title
A bill for an act requiring county and city property assessors to stand for retention at election and including applicability provisions. (See SF 411.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 411. S.J. 438. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Subcommittee: Garrett, Guth, and Quirmbach. S.J. 126. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Local Government. S.J. 88. |
Same As/Similar To
SF411 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Subcommittee reassigned: Edler, Garrett, and J. Smith. S.J. 68.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF49 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF49.html |