IA SF5 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-29 - Subcommittee reassigned: Segebart, Hogg, and Rozenboom.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-29 - Subcommittee reassigned: Segebart, Hogg, and Rozenboom.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act repealing the property tax exemption for forest reservations and including applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act repealing the property tax exemption for forest reservations and including applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Segebart, Hogg, and Rozenboom. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Rozenboom, Hogg, and Zumbach. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Rozenboom, Hogg, and Zumbach. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Subcommittee: Segebart, Hogg, and Rozenboom. S.J. 124. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Natural Resources and Environment. S.J. 80. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF5 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF5.html |