IA SF515 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 621. S.J. 948.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 621. S.J. 948.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to access to a copy of an original birth certificate by an adult adoptee or an entitled person, and providing for fees. (Formerly SF 126; See SF 621.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to access to a copy of an original birth certificate by an adult adoptee or an entitled person, and providing for fees. (Formerly SF 126; See SF 621.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 621. S.J. 948. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Subcommittee: Sweeney, Schultz, and Wahls. S.J. 824. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 800. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 490. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 484. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB77 (Related) 2020-01-15 - Subcommittee reassigned: Bergan, Jacobsen and Konfrst. H.J. 80.
SF126 (Similar To) 2020-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 515. S.J. 490.
SF621 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Committee amendment H-8146 filed. H.J. 579.
SF126 (Similar To) 2020-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 515. S.J. 490.
SF621 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Committee amendment H-8146 filed. H.J. 579.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF515 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF515.html |