IA SF53 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to abortions including prohibiting abortions after a certain postfertilization age with certain exceptions, providing penalties, and including effective date provisions. (See SF 471.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to abortions including prohibiting abortions after a certain postfertilization age with certain exceptions, providing penalties, and including effective date provisions. (See SF 471.)
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Zaun [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Subcommittee: Costello, Bolkcom, and Chelgren. S.J. 88. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 71. |
Same As/Similar To
SF471 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1136.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF53 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF53.html |