IA SF532 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 949.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to notice and opportunity to repair construction defects in new construction, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1146.) Effective 4-15-19.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to notice and opportunity to repair construction defects in new construction, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1146.) Effective 4-15-19.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15SenateSigned by Governor. S.J. 949.
2019-04-15SenateReported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 949.
2019-04-04SenateMessage from House. S.J. 855.
2019-04-03HouseImmediate message. H.J. 736.
2019-04-03HousePassed House, yeas 99, nays none. H.J. 730.
2019-04-03HouseSubstituted for HF 678. H.J. 730.
2019-03-20HouseRead first time, passed on file. H.J. 590.
2019-03-20HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 589.
2019-03-20SenateImmediate message. S.J. 682.
2019-03-20SenatePassed Senate, yeas 42, nays 7. S.J. 681.
2019-03-20SenateAmendment S-3048 adopted. S.J. 681.
2019-03-19SenateAmendment S-3048 filed. S.J. 676.
2019-03-07SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 510.
2019-03-07SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 500.

Same As/Similar To

SSB1146 (Related) 2019-03-04 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HSB177 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 419.
HF678 (Similar To) 2019-04-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 736.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback