IA SF568 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-15 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Kinney, and Whiting. S.J. 87.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-15 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Kinney, and Whiting. S.J. 87.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to officer-involved shootings and officer-involved critical incidents. (Formerly SSB 1198.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to officer-involved shootings and officer-involved critical incidents. (Formerly SSB 1198.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-15 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Kinney, and Whiting. S.J. 87. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 859. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 525. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 518. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1198 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF568 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF568.html |