IA SF572 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-19 - Message from House, with amendment S-3190. S.J. 1025.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-19 - Message from House, with amendment S-3190. S.J. 1025.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to controlled substances, including amending information collection and reporting requirements under the Iowa prescription monitoring program, amending the controlled substance schedules, removing certain references to marijuana, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1230.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to controlled substances, including amending information collection and reporting requirements under the Iowa prescription monitoring program, amending the controlled substance schedules, removing certain references to marijuana, making penalties applicable, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1230.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - House - Passed House (Y: 53 N: 43 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 53 N: 43 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 53 N: 43 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-19 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-3190. S.J. 1025. |
2019-04-18 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 922. |
2019-04-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1013. |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed House, yeas 53 nays 43. H.J. 921. |
2019-04-18 | House | Amendment H-1249B adopted. H.J. 921. |
2019-04-18 | House | Amendment H-1249A adopted. H.J. 920. |
2019-04-18 | House | Amendment H-1249 filed. H.J. 920. |
2019-04-18 | House | Amendment H-1240 withdrawn. H.J. 920. |
2019-04-18 | House | Substituted for HF 728. H.J. 919. |
2019-04-17 | House | Amendment H-1240 filed. H.J. 900. |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 621. |
2019-03-21 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 617. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 705. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 46, nays 0. S.J. 705. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 528. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 519. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB140 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 421.
SSB1230 (Related) 2019-03-04 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/05/2019 3:45PM RM 315.
HF728 (Similar To) 2019-04-18 - Withdrawn. H.J. 922.
SSB1230 (Related) 2019-03-04 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/05/2019 3:45PM RM 315.
HF728 (Similar To) 2019-04-18 - Withdrawn. H.J. 922.