IA SF580 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Withdrawn. S.J. 883.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Withdrawn. S.J. 883.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the liability of private employers, general contractors, and premises owners for negligently hiring employees, agents, or independent contractors convicted of a public offense. (Formerly SSB 1220.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the liability of private employers, general contractors, and premises owners for negligently hiring employees, agents, or independent contractors convicted of a public offense. (Formerly SSB 1220.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 883. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | HF 650 substituted. S.J. 882. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Amendment S-3125 filed, adopted. S.J. 882. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 857. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Attached to similar HF 650. S.J. 641. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 527. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 520. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1220 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF580 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF580.html |