IA SF586 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-12 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-12 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing a criminal penalty for violent repeat offenders and providing for risk assessments. (Formerly SF 381.)
Title
A bill for an act establishing a criminal penalty for violent repeat offenders and providing for risk assessments. (Formerly SF 381.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 164. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/22/2020 11:00AM RM G17. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Subcommittee: Nunn, Hogg, and Sweeney. S.J. 88. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 859. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 548. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 545. |
Same As/Similar To
SF381 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 586. S.J. 548.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF586 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF586.html |