IA SF587 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2095. S.J. 165.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2095. S.J. 165.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act allowing county attorneys and assistant county attorneys to obtain a professional permit to carry weapons. (Formerly SSB 1007; See SF 2095.)
Title
A bill for an act allowing county attorneys and assistant county attorneys to obtain a professional permit to carry weapons. (Formerly SSB 1007; See SF 2095.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2095. S.J. 165. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/22/2020 1:30PM RM 315. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Subcommittee: Nunn, Kinney, and Sinclair. S.J. 88. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 859. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 548. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 545. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1007 (Related) 2019-01-31 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/04/2019 11:30AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
SF2095 (Similar To) 2020-03-03 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF2095 (Similar To) 2020-03-03 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF587 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF587.html |