IA SF594 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1089.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1089.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to postconviction DNA profiling procedure. (Formerly SSB 1136.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to postconviction DNA profiling procedure. (Formerly SSB 1136.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 1089. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | HF 734 substituted. S.J. 1088. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Amendment S-3217 filed, adopted. S.J. 1088. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 858. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Attached to similar HF 734. S.J. 743. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 594. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 593. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1136 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HSB142 (Related) 2019-03-07 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 468.
HF734 (Similar To) 2019-05-16 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1083.
HSB142 (Related) 2019-03-07 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 468.
HF734 (Similar To) 2019-05-16 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1083.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF594 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF594.html |