IA SF602 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1130.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1130.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to incentives for whole grade sharing and school district reorganization or dissolution. (Formerly SSB 1032, SF 138.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to incentives for whole grade sharing and school district reorganization or dissolution. (Formerly SSB 1032, SF 138.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 1130. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | HF 596 substituted. S.J. 1129. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 596. S.J. 996. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 710. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 709. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1032 (Related) 2019-01-24 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF138 (Similar To) 2019-03-21 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 602. S.J. 710.
HSB130 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 382.
HF596 (Similar To) 2019-05-09 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1081.
SF138 (Similar To) 2019-03-21 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 602. S.J. 710.
HSB130 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 382.
HF596 (Similar To) 2019-05-09 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1081.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF602 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF602.html |