IA SF603 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1197.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1197.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to use of concurrent enrollment programs for teaching certain subjects required under the educational standards, to the enrollment of pupils under concurrent enrollment program agreements between certain accredited nonpublic schools and community colleges, and to the criminal offense of sexual exploitation by a school employee providing instruction under a concurrent enrollment program, making penalties applicable, and including retroactive and other applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1163, SF 488.) Effective 7-1-19.
Title
A bill for an act relating to use of concurrent enrollment programs for teaching certain subjects required under the educational standards, to the enrollment of pupils under concurrent enrollment program agreements between certain accredited nonpublic schools and community colleges, and to the criminal offense of sexual exploitation by a school employee providing instruction under a concurrent enrollment program, making penalties applicable, and including retroactive and other applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1163, SF 488.) Effective 7-1-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - Passed House (Y: 57 N: 38 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - Passed House (Y: 57 N: 38 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | House | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1197. |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1193. |
2019-04-26 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1054. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1163. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 1162. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-3260. S.J. 1161. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-3260. S.J. 1160. |
2019-04-26 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1053. |
2019-04-27 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1077. |
2019-04-26 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1055. |
2019-04-26 | House | Passed House, yeas 57 nays 38. H.J. 1051. |
2019-04-27 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1077. |
2019-04-26 | House | Committee amendment H-1286 adopted, as amended. H.J. 1051. |
2019-04-27 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1077. |
2019-04-26 | House | Amendment H-1318 to committee amendment H-1286 adopted. H.J. 1050. |
2019-04-26 | House | Amendment H-1318 to committee amendment H-1286 filed. H.J. 1049. |
2019-04-26 | House | Amendment H-1313 to committee amendment H-1286 filed, withdrawn. H.J. 1049. |
2019-04-23 | House | Committee amendment H-1286 filed. H.J. 984. |
2019-04-23 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 982. |
2019-04-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-04-18 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/22/2019 11:30AM House Lounge. |
2019-04-17 | House | Subcommittee: Deyoe, Kerr and Running-Marquardt. H.J. 900. |
2019-04-17 | House | Read first time, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 886. |
2019-04-16 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 863. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 971. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 970. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 729. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Read first time, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 727. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1163 (Related) 2019-02-14 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/18/2019 2:30PM RM 315.
SF488 (Similar To) 2019-03-25 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 603. S.J. 729.
SF488 (Similar To) 2019-03-25 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 603. S.J. 729.