IA SF605 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1197.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1197.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the application fee and annual fee imposed for nonassistance child support cases. (Formerly SSB 1211, SF 543.) Effective 7-1-19.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the application fee and annual fee imposed for nonassistance child support cases. (Formerly SSB 1211, SF 543.) Effective 7-1-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1197. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1193. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1077. |
2019-04-23 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 979. |
2019-04-23 | House | Passed House, yeas 98 nays none. H.J. 956. |
2019-04-23 | House | Substituted for HF 739. H.J. 955. |
2019-04-22 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 930. |
2019-04-22 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 930. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1035. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 1034. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 776. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 773. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB69 (Related) 2019-02-21 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 347.
HF511 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Withdrawn. H.J. 980.
SSB1211 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF543 (Similar To) 2019-03-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 605. S.J. 776.
HF739 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Withdrawn. H.J. 980.
HF511 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Withdrawn. H.J. 980.
SSB1211 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF543 (Similar To) 2019-03-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 605. S.J. 776.
HF739 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Withdrawn. H.J. 980.