IA SF606 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-12 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-12 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the transfer of investment tax credits issued to housing businesses under the enterprise zone program, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 103.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the transfer of investment tax credits issued to housing businesses under the enterprise zone program, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 103.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-12 | House | Fiscal note. |
2020-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-05 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/11/2020 9:00AM House Lounge. |
2020-01-28 | House | Subcommittee: Mitchell, Bloomingdale and James. H.J. 152. |
2019-04-16 | House | Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 861. |
2019-04-15 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 848. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 953. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 50, nays 0. S.J. 953. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 776. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 774. |
Same As/Similar To
SF103 (Similar To) 2019-03-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 606. S.J. 776.