IA SF609 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1197.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1197.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations and related statutory changes involving state government entities involved with agriculture, natural resources, and environmental protection, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1251.) Various effective dates; see section 31 of bill.
Title
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations and related statutory changes involving state government entities involved with agriculture, natural resources, and environmental protection, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1251.) Various effective dates; see section 31 of bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - House - Passed House (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Passed House (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Passed House (Y: 54 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1197. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1193. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1078. |
2019-04-23 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 979. |
2019-04-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1012. |
2019-04-23 | House | Passed House, yeas 55 nays 44. H.J. 966. |
2019-04-22 | House | NOBA: Final |
2019-04-23 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-1268. H.J. 965. |
2019-04-22 | House | NOBA: Senate Floor Second |
2019-04-22 | House | Senate amendment H-1268 filed. H.J. 947. |
2019-04-22 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 946. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1042. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 33, nays 16. S.J. 1042. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-3171, as amended. S.J. 1042. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Amendment S-3199 to S-3171 filed, adopted. S.J. 1041. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | NOBA: House Floor |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-3171. S.J. 984. |
2019-04-16 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 883. |
2019-04-16 | House | Passed House, yeas 54 nays 45. H.J. 878. |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee amendment H-1206 adopted, as amended. H.J. 877. |
2019-04-16 | House | Amendment H-1220 to committee amendment H-1206 filed, withdrawn. H.J. 877. |
2019-04-16 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 877. |
2019-04-16 | House | Motion to suspend rules to consider H-1236 to committee amendment H-1206. H.J. 876. |
2019-04-16 | House | Point of order raised on H-1236 to committee amendment H-1206, ruled not germane. H.J. 876. |
2019-04-16 | House | Amendment H-1236 to committee amendment H-1206 filed. H.J. 876. |
2019-04-16 | House | Amendment H-1224 to committee amendment H-1206 filed, adopted. H.J. 876. |
2019-04-16 | House | Amendment H-1232 to committee amendment H-1206 lost. H.J. 876. |
2019-04-16 | House | Amendment H-1232 to committee amendment H-1206 filed. H.J. 875. |
2019-04-16 | House | Point of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point well taken. H.J. 875. |
2019-04-16 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 875. |
2019-04-16 | House | Motion to suspend rules to consider H-1233 to committee amendment H-1206. H.J. 874. |
2019-04-16 | House | Point of order raised on H-1233 to committee amendment H-1206, ruled not germane. H.J. 874. |
2019-04-12 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2019-04-16 | House | Amendment H-1233 to committee amendment H-1206 filed. H.J. 873. |
2019-04-11 | House | NOBA: House Sub |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee amendment H-1206 filed. H.J. 844. |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 844. |
2019-04-09 | House | Read first time, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 767. |
2019-04-09 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 767. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Floor |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 887. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 32, nays 18. S.J. 886. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Amendment S-3129 filed, ruled out of order. S.J. 886. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Amendment S-3133 filed, lost. S.J. 885. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Amendment S-3134 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 885. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Amendment S-3127 adopted. S.J. 885. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Amendment S-3137 to S-3127 filed, lost. S.J. 884. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Amendment S-3127 filed. S.J. 884. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 858. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 815. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 814. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Full Approps |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1251 (Related) 2019-03-28 - NOBA: Senate Sub