IA SF638 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-27 - NOBA: Final
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-27 - NOBA: Final
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to state and local finances by making appropriations, providing for legal and regulatory responsibilities, providing for other properly related matters, and including effective date, applicability, and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1262.) Various effective dates; see sections 22, 23, 30, 44, and 60 of bill.
Title
A bill for an act relating to state and local finances by making appropriations, providing for legal and regulatory responsibilities, providing for other properly related matters, and including effective date, applicability, and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1262.) Various effective dates; see sections 22, 23, 30, 44, and 60 of bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - Passed House (Y: 53 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 53 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - Passed House (Y: 53 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 53 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-27 | House | NOBA: Final |
2019-05-08 | House | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1198. |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1193. |
2019-04-27 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1079. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1181. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 32, nays 16. S.J. 1180. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-3262. S.J. 1180. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-3262. S.J. 1168. |
2019-04-27 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1063. |
2019-04-27 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1077. |
2019-04-27 | House | Passed House, yeas 53 nays 45. H.J. 1063. |
2019-04-27 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1077. |
2019-04-27 | House | Amendment H-1321 adopted. H.J. 1062. |
2019-04-27 | House | Point of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, Speaker resolved the point of order. H.J. 1061. |
2019-04-27 | House | Motion to suspend rules prevailed. H.J. 1061. |
2019-04-27 | House | Motion to suspend rules to consider amendment H-1321. H.J. 1060. |
2019-04-27 | House | Point of order raised on H-1321, ruled not germane. H.J. 1060. |
2019-04-27 | House | Amendment H-1320 adopted. H.J. 1060. |
2019-04-27 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1077. |
2019-04-27 | House | Amendment H-1325 lost, as amended. H.J. 1060. |
2019-04-27 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1077. |
2019-04-27 | House | Amendment H-1326 to amendment H-1325 adopted. H.J. 1059. |
2019-04-27 | House | Amendment H-1326 to amendment H-1325 filed. H.J. 1058. |
2019-04-27 | House | Amendment H-1325 filed. H.J. 1058. |
2019-04-27 | House | Substituted for HF 786. H.J. 1058. |
2019-04-26 | House | NOBA: Senate Floor |
2019-04-26 | House | Amendments H-1320 and H-1321 filed. H.J. 1056. |
2019-04-26 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 1046. |
2019-04-26 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1046. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1144. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 31, nays 18. S.J. 1144. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Amendment S-3237 adopted. S.J. 1143. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Amendment S-3244 to S-3237 filed, ruled out of order. S.J. 1143. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Amendment S-3243 to S-3237 filed, lost. S.J. 1142. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Amendment S-3237 filed. S.J. 1140. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Full Approps |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 1074. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 1073. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1262 (Related) 2019-04-18 - Subcommittee: Committee of the Whole.