IA SF639 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2395. S.J. 470.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2395. S.J. 470.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to lobbying activities by political subdivisions. (Formerly SSB 1261; See SF 2395.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to lobbying activities by political subdivisions. (Formerly SSB 1261; See SF 2395.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2395. S.J. 470. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2020 2:00PM RM G17. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Whiting, Bisignano, and Sinclair. S.J. 70. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Government Oversight. S.J. 1191. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 1111. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 1111. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1261 (Related) 2019-04-17 - Subcommittee Meeting: 04/18/2019 9:30AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
SF2395 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 470.
SF2395 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 470.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF639 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF639.html |