IA SF76 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the use of an electronic communication device while driving, and providing penalties.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the use of an electronic communication device while driving, and providing penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/26/2020 11:30AM Room 217. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Carlin, Brown, and Wahls. S.J. 274. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/17/2019 11:00AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Subcommittee: Feenstra, R. Smith, and Wahls. S.J. 342. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 317. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 315. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Subcommittee: Whiting, Danielson, and Kapucian. S.J. 232. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Transportation. S.J. 191. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee: Whiting, Hogg, and Shipley. S.J. 158. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 143. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF76 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF76.html |