IA SF86 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act requiring the department of natural resources to include anatomical donor symbols on certain licenses. Effective 7-1-19.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act requiring the department of natural resources to include anatomical donor symbols on certain licenses. Effective 7-1-19.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06HouseSigned by Governor.
2019-05-02HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
2019-04-24HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 1003.
2019-04-24SenateImmediate message. S.J. 1105.
2019-04-24SenatePassed Senate, yeas 50, nays 0. S.J. 1104.
2019-04-24SenateSenate concurred with S-3213. S.J. 1104.
2019-04-24SenateMessage from House, with amendment S-3213. S.J. 1078.
2019-04-23HouseImmediate message. H.J. 979.
2019-04-25HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1012.
2019-04-23HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 981.
2019-04-23HousePassed House, yeas 98 nays none. H.J. 952.
2019-04-23HouseCommittee amendment H-1077 adopted. H.J. 952.
2019-04-11HousePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 843.
2019-03-26HouseCommittee amendment H-1077 filed. H.J. 654.
2019-03-26HouseCommittee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 653.
2019-03-25HouseSubcommittee recommends passage.
2019-03-19HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 03/25/2019 11:00AM House Lounge.
2019-03-18HouseSubcommittee: Jeneary, Ourth and Thorup. H.J. 565.
2019-02-21HouseRead first time, referred to Natural Resources. H.J. 339.
2019-02-20HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 329.
2019-02-20SenateImmediate message. S.J. 350.
2019-02-25SenateExplanation of vote. S.J. 393.
2019-02-20SenatePassed Senate, yeas 47, nays 0. S.J. 349.
2019-02-20SenateAmendment S-3007 adopted. S.J. 349.
2019-02-19SenateAmendment S-3007 filed. S.J. 347.
2019-02-14SenateCommittee report, recommending passage. S.J. 314.
2019-01-24SenateSubcommittee: Rozenboom, Boulton, and Sweeney. S.J. 166.
2019-01-23SenateIntroduced, referred to Natural Resources and Environment. S.J. 154.

Same As/Similar To

HF148 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Withdrawn. H.J. 980.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback